KONGOLESE CHILDREN'S ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1104079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 December 2016 On time Download