Financial history INTERNATIONAL CARE NETWORK

Charity number: 1099400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £379.04k £430.28k £494.59k £454.02k £454.32k
Total expenditure £350.92k £430.17k £475.56k £440.99k £415.39k
Income from government contracts £263.21k £282.61k £365.75k £276.45k £242.03k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.92k