Accounts and annual returns INTERNATIONAL CARE NETWORK

Charity number: 1099400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window