THE OXFORD SYMPOSIUM ON FOOD AND COOKERY

Charity number: 1100956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £86.61k £105.90k £98.92k £123.08k £50.09k
Total expenditure £85.80k £106.26k £109.96k £121.85k £50.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A