THE OXFORD SYMPOSIUM ON FOOD AND COOKERY

Charity number: 1100956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Elaine Mahon Trustee 05 August 2021 None on record
Carolyn Elizabeth Steel Trustee 06 August 2020 None on record
Elisabeth Luard Chair 11 November 2016 None on record
David Matchett Trustee 11 November 2016 None on record
Priscilla Anne White Trustee 05 August 2021
THE CONFRATERNITY OF SAINT JAMES Received: On time
Dr Scott Alves Barton Trustee 05 August 2021 None on record
URSULA HEINZELMANN Trustee 08 July 2016 None on record
Professor Mark Bradford McWilliams Trustee 05 November 2020 None on record
Jillian Mary Norman Trustee 05 August 2021 None on record
Harold James McGee Trustee 05 August 2021 None on record
Jake Tilson Trustee 05 August 2021 None on record
Cathy Kaufman Trustee 10 July 2017 None on record
DR Polly Russell Trustee 11 November 2016 None on record
Gamze Ineceli Trustee 10 July 2017 None on record
Jessica Seaton Trustee 09 July 2018 None on record
Doug Duda Trustee 11 November 2016 None on record