BALLET BLACK

Charity number: 1101599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £344.75k £483.55k £520.89k £628.16k £648.21k
Total expenditure £278.98k £434.77k £473.40k £515.58k £423.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £134.97k £201.23k £212.16k £324.71k £365.73k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £337.53k £351.84k £506.36k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £164.58k £261.22k £120.04k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £18.78k £15.10k £21.81k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £436.17k £467.34k £393.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £37.23k £48.24k £30.78k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0