Accounts and annual returns THE CHASE COMMUNITY FRIENDS

Charity number: 1102105
Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 157 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 157 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 17 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 17 April 2020 353 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 04 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required