Financial history THE CHASE COMMUNITY FRIENDS

Charity number: 1102105
Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £6.12k £3.90k £2.16k £7.97k £2.80k
Total expenditure £5.18k £3.34k £3.40k £3.95k £4.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A