Trustees THE CHASE COMMUNITY FRIENDS

Charity number: 1102105
Charity reporting is overdue by 158 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR VIC HATTON Chair
None on record
CAROLE WYATT Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
GILLIAN JELLEY Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Rosemary Ishbel Hawthorne New Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
GORDON HENRY OXFORD Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
SALLY CLARKE Trustee 01 November 2017
None on record
ANGELA GORDON-SNAPE Trustee 08 October 2015
None on record
SUSAN HALL Trustee 10 March 2015
None on record
BARBARA WILLIAMSON Trustee
None on record
HELEN Hatton Trustee
None on record