Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, CHELTENHAM

Charity number: 1102463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £25.02k £48.95k £18.40k £36.63k £5.09k
Total expenditure £23.96k £24.98k £5.32k £12.90k £422
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A