Trustees FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, CHELTENHAM

Charity number: 1102463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER ORMEROD Chair
None on record
Joanne Mundy Trustee 20 July 2019
None on record
Kenneth Syme Trustee 21 July 2018
None on record
M BRYAN LAWRY Trustee 23 July 2016
None on record
RICHARD JOHN CHECKETTS Trustee 19 July 2014
None on record
Elizabeth Mary Horder Trustee 13 July 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST MATTHEW, CHELTENHAM
Received: On time
Christine Ormerod Trustee
None on record