ADVANCE HE

Charity number: 1101607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 28 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 12 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 12 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 17 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 17 February 2017 On time Download