BCR GJAG LTD

Charity number: 1101438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 March 2020 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 April 2020 61 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 March 2018 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 March 2018 48 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 01 January 2017 On time Download