NAVAL & MILITARY BIBLE SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 1102593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 November 2018 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 November 2018 28 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 13 February 2017 On time Download