THE LICHFIELD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED)

Charity number: 1107827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £18.87m £18.28m £18.37m £18.20m £16.56m
Total expenditure £17.90m £18.39m £19.03m £18.52m £17.47m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £251.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £11.77m £14.04m £14.33m £14.30m £10.06m
Income - Other trading activities £366.00k £390.00k £396.00k £497.00k £482.00k
Income - Charitable activities £1.79m £1.92m £1.95m £1.85m £1.18m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.31m £1.48m £1.49m £1.49m £1.25m
Income - Other £3.64m £457.00k £205.00k £58.00k £3.59m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £17.70m £17.87m £18.70m £18.31m £17.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £360 £91.00k £93.00k £0 £156.00k
Expenditure - Governance £115.00k £124.00k £49.00k £146.00k £137.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.69m £1.72m £2.96m £3.02m £2.50m
Expenditure - Investment management £360 £91.00k £62.00k £0 £138.00k
Expenditure - Other £197.00k £431.00k £238.00k £211.00k £26.00k