THE LICHFIELD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED)

Charity number: 1107827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

26 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RT REVD DR MICHAEL GEOFFREY IPGRAVE OBE Trustee 24 September 2016
THE ANGLICAN-LUTHERAN SOCIETY Received: On time
The Rt Revd Sarah Bullock Trustee 03 July 2019
NORTH SHROPSHIRE COMMUNITY CARE TRUST Received: On time
LICHFIELD THEOLOGICAL COLLEGE GENERAL PURPOSES FUND (TRUST 142) Received: On time
TRANSFORMING COMMUNITIES TOGETHER Received: On time
ELLESMERE COLLEGE LIMITED Received: On time
ST JOHN'S COLLEGE, DURHAM Received: 16 days late
DAVID BESWICK Trustee None on record
RT REVD CLIVE MALCOLM GREGORY Trustee
BLACK COUNTRY URBAN INDUSTRIAL MISSION Received: On time
Dr SUSAN KAREN WELLER Trustee 01 January 2015
THE LICHFIELD DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
THE VEN PAUL THOMAS Trustee 28 October 2011
NORTH SHROPSHIRE COMMUNITY CARE TRUST Received: On time
SHROPSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST Received: On time
THE LICHFIELD DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
Rev Michael Metcalf Trustee 07 September 2021 None on record
RICHARD JOHN PITHERS Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
THE VERY REV ADRIAN DORBER Trustee
LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL SCHOOL Received: On time
MR TUG WILSON Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. CHAD, LICHFIELD Received: On time
JOHN GUTHRIE CLARK Trustee None on record
JOSEPHINE LOCKE Trustee 06 November 2013 None on record
CYRIL RANDLES Trustee 07 September 2021
WIGHTWICK & REGIS ENTERPRISE NETWORK Overdue by 131 days
PENELOPE ALLEN Trustee 28 November 2012
OPEN SYNOD GROUP Received: On time
JOHN THOMAS NAYLOR Trustee 27 November 2012 None on record
Rev BENJAMIN WHITMORE Trustee 01 February 2018 None on record
Rt Rev MATTHEW JOHN PARKER Trustee 26 September 2013
LICHFIELD THEOLOGICAL COLLEGE GENERAL PURPOSES FUND (TRUST 142) Received: On time
SOPHIA ANNE MOSLEY BEQUEST Received: On time
MERCIAN COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time
THE LICHFIELD DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
THE LICHFIELD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION Received: On time
Dr Paul Alexander Graetz Trustee 20 September 2018 None on record
CHRISTOPHER GILL Trustee 30 November 2012 None on record
The Venerable Julian Francis Trustee 08 November 2019
TRANSFORMING COMMUNITIES TOGETHER Received: On time
ANDREW PAUL CHARLES Trustee 01 February 2013 None on record
REV PREB BRAIN LEATHERS Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Dr John Richard Fawn Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Rev JULIA CODY Trustee 01 February 2016 None on record
Rev PHILIP JOHN CANSDALE Trustee 27 November 2012
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, MEOLE BRACE, SHREWSBURY Received: On time
LILAS RAWLING Trustee 28 November 2012
MICHAEL LOWE'S AND ASSOCIATED CHARITIES Received: On time