Financial history ST TERESA'S CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER FRIEND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1102674
Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £11.87k £17.29k £16.49k £5.41k £1.35k
Total expenditure £9.99k £12.99k £19.93k £7.47k £345
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A