CAVALIER KING CHARLES SPANIEL RESCUE & WELFARE

Charity number: 1104112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.67k £337.13k £315.95k £11.19k £18.26k
Total expenditure £21.57k £15.38k £20.48k £122.76k £19.82k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A