CAVALIER KING CHARLES SPANIEL RESCUE & WELFARE

Charity number: 1104112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID SEDGBEER Chair 09 December 2013 None on record
Marilyn Joy Pipkin Trustee 17 July 2015 None on record
ANDREA SEDGBEER Trustee 09 December 2013 None on record
Claire Witten Trustee 07 October 2014 None on record
Roslyn Loades Trustee 07 November 2018 None on record
SUE MANGHAM Trustee 08 August 2018 None on record
Hilda Brewer Trustee 17 July 2015 None on record