Accounts and annual returns VIKING CENTRE & YOUTH CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1102969
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 March 2023 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 March 2023 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 February 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required