Financial history SOUNDABOUT

Charity number: 1103002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £183.94k £304.74k £263.11k £376.84k £451.99k
Total expenditure £245.13k £239.68k £291.60k £417.68k £377.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A