Trustees SOUNDABOUT

Charity number: 1103002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ben Weston-Conway Trustee 12 January 2022
None on record
Mike Hartley Trustee 12 January 2022
None on record
Sophia Nicholls Trustee 08 November 2021
ADVENTIST SPECIAL NEEDS ASSOCIATION UK
Received: On time
Yogesh Dattani Trustee 31 August 2021
THE UK ASSOCIATION FOR MUSIC EDUCATION - MUSIC MARK
Received: On time
Ceri Thomson Trustee 31 August 2021
EDUCATION FOR DEMOCRACY IN SOUTH AFRICA
Received: On time
Kathryn Jennings Trustee 16 June 2021
None on record
Simon John Claridge Trustee 08 June 2020
None on record
Emily Newsome Trustee 05 March 2019
None on record