Financial history THE HEARTH CENTRE (HORSLEY) LTD

Charity number: 1106143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £60.60k £58.50k £50.03k £41.02k £46.57k
Total expenditure £53.02k £53.45k £53.88k £34.06k £46.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £13.19k £18.97k