Accounts and annual returns THE HEARTH CENTRE (HORSLEY) LTD

Charity number: 1106143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window