QUEEN STREET NEIGHBOURHOOD RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity number: 1104088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £56.41k £60.94k £59.31k £55.05k £58.69k
Total expenditure £61.85k £65.88k £66.65k £55.03k £54.33k
Income from government contracts £25.00k £25.00k £0 £2.50k N/A
Income from government grants £5.64k £5.64k £2.91k £1.54k N/A