QUEEN STREET NEIGHBOURHOOD RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity number: 1104088
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTINE BIRKETT Trustee 14 December 2011 None on record
Louise Harrop Trustee 25 February 2020 None on record
CLLR ASGHAR ALI CHAUDHRY Trustee None on record
BARBARA WOODHEAD Trustee None on record
Helen Marie Hall Trustee 17 June 2019 None on record
Rosemary Lamburn Trustee 25 February 2020 None on record
Richard Tilley Trustee 25 February 2010 None on record
Geoffrey Jones Trustee 25 February 2020 None on record
Hazel Woods Trustee 18 February 2019 None on record
HUGH GAVIN WARNER Chair None on record