QUEEN STREET NEIGHBOURHOOD RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity number: 1104088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 23 November 2016 On time Download