Accounts and annual returns LITTLE SWANS (NORFOLK)

Charity number: 1104647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 23 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 18 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 14 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 14 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 27 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 27 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window