Financial history THE ROYAL LEAMINGTON SPA ARCHERY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1107064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £26.30k £28.12k £10.46k £6.03k £12.72k
Total expenditure £18.69k £19.53k £18.95k £7.67k £8.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £999 N/A N/A