ST ANDREW'S COMMUNITY NETWORK

Charity number: 1105307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michelle Addis Trustee 10 January 2017 None on record
Andy Pollard Chair 10 October 2016 None on record
Rev Tim Griffiths Trustee 01 May 2020 None on record
Rev James Green Trustee 04 September 2017 None on record
PAUL BEESLEY Trustee None on record
David Reynolds Trustee 10 January 2017 None on record
Dr HELEN REYNOLDS Trustee 16 April 2012 None on record
Beryl Bellew Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Dr ANNA RICHMAN Trustee 16 April 2012 None on record