ST ANDREW'S COMMUNITY NETWORK

Charity number: 1105307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 03 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 03 October 2016 On time Download