Financial history YORKSHIRE UNIVERSITIES

Charity number: 1109200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £243.03k £179.97k £153.72k £237.31k £223.92k
Total expenditure £249.55k £184.49k £225.61k £226.53k £208.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A