THE ATAXIA-TELANGIECTASIA SOCIETY

Charity number: 1105528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £291.47k £391.79k £834.34k £359.77k £1.06m
Total expenditure £341.42k £351.40k £394.97k £498.29k £553.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £51.40k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £823.71k N/A £1.05m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £2.78k N/A £1.93k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £7.73k N/A £11.97k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £115 N/A £1.15k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £450.00k N/A £680.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £295.86k N/A £425.62k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £99.11k N/A £127.41k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £19.16k N/A £23.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0