THE ATAXIA-TELANGIECTASIA SOCIETY

Charity number: 1105528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LIAN CECILIA YARLETT Trustee None on record
Penny Jeggo Trustee 28 January 2014 None on record
Nicholas Gull Trustee 30 June 2018 None on record
Michael Detsiny Chair 22 April 2015 None on record
Jhilna Shah Trustee 24 January 2018 None on record
Andrew Mills Trustee 28 January 2014 None on record
LINDA CLARKE Trustee 22 April 2015 None on record
LYNDA FINN Trustee 18 September 2013 None on record