AFRICAN SMILE

Charity number: 1109354
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 30 August 2018 04 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2017 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2014 05 August 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2014 Not Required