AFRICAN SMILE

Charity number: 1109354

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SYLVIE MURHOHA Degree Trustee 06 May 2005 None on record
DR MARTINE Trustee 30 November 2004 None on record
Esther KYOLABA Msc Trustee 31 August 2019 None on record
SYMPHORIEN BATTANTOU DEGREE Trustee 31 December 2010 None on record
PATRICK SHAGI Master Trustee 14 July 2011 None on record
WILLY RUKENGWA MBA Trustee 20 May 2005 None on record
OKITO DIMBA TAKONDANYA DR Chair 30 November 2004 None on record