ALBION IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1110978
Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 7 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 7 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 29 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 22 May 2017 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 May 2017 22 days late Download