ALBION IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1110978

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUDITH RICHARDS Trustee 18 November 2016 None on record
PAUL MULLEN Trustee 05 March 2016 None on record
PHILIP CHARLES FRIER Trustee 01 December 2013 None on record
MARTIN PERRY Chair 06 November 2015 None on record
Alan Roy McCarthy Trustee 01 December 2013 None on record
DAVID ANDREW JONES Trustee 01 December 2013 None on record
MARC LOUIS SUGARMAN Trustee 04 May 2011
THE BLOOM FOUNDATION Received: On time
OVERCOMING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS Received: On time
SARAH SHEEHAN Trustee 05 March 2016 None on record