ALBION IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1110978
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £3.24m £3.34m £3.51m £3.25m £3.50m
Total expenditure £3.22m £3.33m £3.44m £3.07m £3.31m
Income from government contracts £0 £205.58k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £414.69k £0 £515.01k £188.04k £344.20k
Income - Donations and legacies £366.81k £597.91k £928.12k £829.71k £829.71k
Income - Other trading activities £2.87m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £2.74m £2.58m £2.42m £2.42m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £231 £836 £626 £1.47k £1.47k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.13m £3.33m £3.44m £2.82m £3.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £207.21k £195.02k
Expenditure - Governance £92.61k £72.20k £18.14k £18.16k £20.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £44.51k £0