Financial history STAGE 2 YOUTH THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1108213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £110.98k £101.89k £80.39k £59.34k £48.01k
Total expenditure £112.48k £103.67k £80.08k £72.10k £48.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A