Trustees STAGE 2 YOUTH THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1108213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Jones-Owen Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record
Fiona Lenton Trustee 24 March 2021
None on record
Emma-Jo Tucker Trustee 05 June 2017
None on record
Keith Dowsett Trustee 05 June 2017
None on record
Bryan Nott Trustee 06 March 2017
THE PUBLIC LAW PROJECT
Received: On time
Paul Parker-Duber Trustee 06 March 2017
None on record
Catherine Groom Trustee 10 February 2015
None on record