THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST

Charity number: 1108369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £316.38k £273.90k £362.57k £345.42k £333.08k
Total expenditure £330.05k £270.71k £362.29k £352.39k £279.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £28.07k