BERWICK-UPON-TWEED COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1109088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 September 2017 On time Download