BERWICK-UPON-TWEED COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1109088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £458.80k £571.30k £1.64m £651.78k £610.44k
Total expenditure £430.06k £529.13k £499.05k £756.04k £626.52k
Income from government contracts £232.55k £231.54k £243.47k £261.50k £266.18k
Income from government grants £5.28k £42.50k £25.72k £210.36k £131.70k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £201.50k £1.27m £305.68k £304.63k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £369.79k £125.46k £66.14k £68.36k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £243.47k £279.95k £235.44k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £2.02k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £529.13k £495.62k £755.11k £626.52k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £5.27k £3.43k £930 £930
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £21.92k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £3.43k £930 £0