AHENFIE CHAPEL

Charity number: 1109280
Charity reporting is up to date (100 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 February 2021 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 February 2021 100 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 December 2019 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 December 2019 51 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 November 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 November 2018 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 November 2017 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 November 2017 14 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 20 February 2017 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 February 2017 112 days late Download