MANCHESTER REFUGEE SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1109990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £82.70k £100.54k £115.47k £155.20k £191.36k
Total expenditure £72.60k £98.79k £70.31k £137.14k £178.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £39.99k £39.99k £40.00k £39.94k £39.94k