BLACK COUNTRY URBAN INDUSTRIAL MISSION

Charity number: 1110745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £27.47k £33.02k £27.64k £27.64k £21.23k
Total expenditure £35.27k £34.49k £35.13k £35.13k £6.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A