BLACK COUNTRY URBAN INDUSTRIAL MISSION

Charity number: 1110745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV DR PAUL ANDREW BEETHAM Trustee None on record
Rev RACHEL ELIZABETH PARKINSON MA Trustee 01 September 2016
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN Received: On time
WOLVERHAMPTON AND SHREWSBURY METHODIST DISTRICT Received: On time
Thomas Russell Chair 18 July 2017 None on record
Rev David Edward Snodgrass Primrose Trustee 10 July 2018
THE DIOCESAN DIGEST SOUND MAGAZINE OF LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL Received: On time
Andy Hewines Trustee 12 July 2016 None on record
REV ADRIAN STUART ARGILE Trustee
THE HEART OF ENGLAND BAPTIST ASSOCIATION Received: On time
UMBERSLADE CHURCH ENDOWMENT Received: On time
RT REVD CLIVE MALCOLM GREGORY Trustee
THE LICHFIELD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED) Received: On time
REVEREND JOHN NICHOLAS LEEMING LATHAM Trustee 14 November 2017
THE JOHNSON OR SECULAR CLERGY ASSOCIATION OF THE ARCHDIOCESE OF BIRMINGHAM Received: 10 days late
HUGH EDGAR WILLIAMS Trustee None on record
RT REV Graham Usher Trustee 04 May 2014 None on record
STEVEN L BROOKS Trustee None on record
CAROLINE CROLLEY Trustee
GREEN RIVERS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION MANAGEMENT LTD (BY GUARANTEE) Received: 22 days late
VERA MAY BIRCH Trustee None on record
James Edward Wooldridge Green Trustee 10 July 2018 None on record
MR DAVID OWEN Trustee
THE GRIMMITT TRUST Received: On time
CHC EVANGELISM TRUST Received: On time
SEVERN VALLEY RAILWAY CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
OLD HALL PEOPLES PARTNERSHIP Received: 5 days late
MILL DAM TRUST Received: On time
DARLASTON YOUTH CENTRE Received: On time
NEW HALL WATER MILL PRESERVATION TRUST Received: On time
DARLASTON BOYS' CLUB Received: On time
SUTTON COLDFIELD YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION Received: On time
THE WALSALL MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERIES DEVELOPMENT TRUST Overdue by 231 days
THE OWEN FAMILY TRUST Received: On time