MAIDSTONE YMCA

Charity number: 1110087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.08m £1.01m £1.05m £1.13m £1.16m
Total expenditure £986.91k £1.09m £1.13m £1.14m £1.19m
Income from government contracts £121.38k £162.98k £202.06k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £5.00k £5.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.06m £997.73k £1.04m £1.12m £1.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £18.62k £8.68k £7.52k £9.64k £11.02k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £986.91k £1.09m £1.13m £1.14m £1.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £15.30k £7.20k £10.32k £9.65k £9.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0