MAIDSTONE YMCA

Charity number: 1110087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEITH ANTHONY MANDY Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
John Andrew Collins Trustee 23 April 2014 None on record
DEREK JOHN MORTIMER Trustee 24 September 2010
HAYLE PARK NATURE RESERVE Recently registered
STEPHANIE JOY ROSE Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
BRYAN PRICE Chair 23 May 2005 None on record
VALERIE WALLIS Trustee 23 May 2005
FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS CHURCH STAPLEHURST Received: On time
SUSAN FRAZER-MACKINTOSH Trustee 26 September 2013 None on record